ND 2149 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-02, subsection 1 of section 48-01.2-04, and subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 48-01.2-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public improvement contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public improvement contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20SenateSigned by Governor 03/20
2015-03-19SenateSent to Governor
2015-03-19SenateSigned by President
2015-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-18SenateReturned to Senate
2015-03-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1
2015-03-13HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2015-03-12HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2015-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2015-02-04HouseReceived from Senate
2015-02-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2015-02-02SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2015-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback