ND 2147 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bond requirements for public improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bond requirements for public improvements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-23SenateSigned by President
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-22SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-03-17HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1
2017-01-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-06SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback