ND 2146 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the office of management and budget for accessibility improvements on the state capitol grounds; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the office of management and budget for accessibility improvements on the state capitol grounds; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-16SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-16SenateSigned by President
2021-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-14SenateConcurred
2021-04-12SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-12HouseEmergency clause carried
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
2021-04-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2
2021-04-05HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-04-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2
2021-03-23HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-22HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-19HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-17SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-12SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-08SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback