ND SB2145 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 50-10.3 and a new section to chapter 50-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to long-term care facilities and unaccompanied undocumented children; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Access to long-term care facilities and unaccompanied undocumented children; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Greg Westlind [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 13 |
2021-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Conference committee appointed Tveit Skroch Rohr |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed K. Roers O. Larsen Hogan |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-09 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 1 |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |