ND SB2145 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 34-14-05 and 34-14-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to investigation of wage collection claims; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Investigation of wage collection claims; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |