ND 2145 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-03-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to certification of delegates to the United States convention of the states.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certification of delegates to the United States convention of the states.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
2017-03-27HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 7
2017-02-06SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-06SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback