ND 2143 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee Hearing 09:00
Pending: Joint Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-05-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to wearing fluorescent pink or certain camouflage patterns while hunting big game.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wearing fluorescent pink or certain camouflage patterns while hunting big game.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2021-01-25HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2021-01-21SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback