ND 2143 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 43-12.3-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the health care professional student loan repayment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The health care professional student loan repayment program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2019-03-13SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-13SenateSigned by President
2019-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-12SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3
2019-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-01-22HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-01-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2019-01-14SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback