ND 2143 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Signed by Governor 03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 21-06-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the investment of public funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The investment of public funds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-18SenateSigned by Governor 03/18
2013-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2013-03-13SenateSigned by President
2013-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-12SenateReturned to Senate
2013-03-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2013-03-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0
2013-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2013-02-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2013-01-29HouseReceived from Senate
2013-01-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2013-01-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2013-01-24SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback