ND 2143 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-06-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use of medical advice by the director of the department of transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of medical advice by the director of the department of transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
2011-04-25 Signed by Governor 04/25
2011-04-22 Signed by President
2011-03-10 Signed by Speaker
2011-03-08 Returned to Senate
2011-03-07 Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2011-03-04 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2011-03-04 Committee Hearing 10:00
2011-02-23 Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2011-02-07 Received from Senate
2011-02-04 Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2011-02-03 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-02-02 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2011-01-21 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-01-06 Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback