ND SB2142 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to construction manager at-risk subcontractor bids.
Title
Construction manager at-risk subcontractor bids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/24 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |