ND SB2141 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-32-01, 43-32-02, 43-32-05, 43-32-06.1, 43-32-07, 43-32-08.1, 43-32-12, 43-32-13, 43-32-14, 43-32-16, 42-32-17, 43-32-19.1, 43-32-20, 43-32-20.1, 43-32-24, 43-32-26, 43-32-27, 43-32-27.1, and 43-32-30 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation by the state board of psychologist examiners; and to repeal sections 43-32-33 and 43-32-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to applied behavior analysis.
Title
Applied behavior analysis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 5 |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2017-02-23 | House | Request return from committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |