ND SB2140 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 62.1-04-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to producing a concealed weapon license upon request; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Producing a concealed weapon license upon request; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/25 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference committee appointed M. Ruby Damschen Zubke |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Myrdal Luick Bakke |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-04-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2019-04-10 | House | Reconsidered |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 53 nays 38 |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |