ND SB2140 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 8 of section 26.1-04-03, subsection 2 of section 26.1-04-06, and subsection 2 of section 26.1-25-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on insurance rebates.
Title
Limitations on insurance rebates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |