ND 2139 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-27.2 and a new section to chapter 57-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax rate reduction fund and an income tax rate adjustment; and to provide for a transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An income tax rate reduction fund and an income tax rate adjustment; and to provide for a transfer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
2021-04-27SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-27SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-23HouseConference committee appointed Steiner Headland Dockter
2021-04-22SenateConference committee appointed Burckhard Bell Oban
2021-04-22SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-20SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 15
2021-04-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-04-12HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2021-04-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2021-04-05HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2021-04-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3
2021-03-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8
2021-02-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-19SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-04SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba2139.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-03005a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-03006a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-03012a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0209-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-33.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-74.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback