ND SB2138 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to certification of assisters for health benefit exchanges; to amend and reenact subdivision mm of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history background checks; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Criminal history background checks; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |