ND 2136 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02 and 15.1-21-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public and nonpublic high schools offering elective instruction on the Bible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public and nonpublic high schools offering elective instruction on the Bible.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
2019-01-24SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-01-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback