ND 2135 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for the creation of an initiated and referred measure study commission; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for the creation of an initiated and referred measure study commission; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateSigned by Governor 04/19
2017-04-18SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-18SenateSigned by President
2017-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-17HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 19
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 9, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-17SenateReconsidered
2017-04-14SenateEmergency clause failed
2017-04-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 14
2017-04-14SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-10HouseAppoint Rep. Johnston to replace Rep. P. Anderson on conference committee
2017-04-04HouseConference committee appointed B. Koppelman Olson P. Anderson
2017-04-03SenateConference committee appointed Poolman Hogue Marcellais
2017-04-03SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-29HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 65 nays 27
2017-03-28HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 8, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-14SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0
2017-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-31SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-31SenateAmendment adopted
2017-01-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-01-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2135.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-04004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-07000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-07009a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-08000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-09000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0399-10000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-57.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-68.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback