ND 2134 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 61-33.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the ownership of mineral rights of land inundated by Pick-Sloan Missouri basin project dams; to provide appropriations; to provide a contingent line of credit; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The ownership of mineral rights of land inundated by Pick-Sloan Missouri basin project dams; to provide appropriations; to provide a contingent line of credit; to provide for retroactive application; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateSigned by Governor 04/21
2017-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-19HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 15
2017-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 8, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-18SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17HouseAppoint Rep. D. Anderson to replace Rep. Martinson on conference committee
2017-04-12SenateAppoint Sen. Cook to replace Sen. Armstrong on conference committee
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Keiser Martinson Mock
2017-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Unruh Armstrong Oban
2017-04-10SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-06SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-06HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 79 nays 11
2017-04-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1
2017-03-27HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-27HouseAmendment adopted
2017-03-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-10HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 9
2017-02-07SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-06SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2017-01-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2134.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-05006a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-08000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-09000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-10000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0159-11000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-25.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-63.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-70.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback