ND SB2133 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 39-10-41 and 39-10-43 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to railroad grade crossings; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Railroad grade crossings; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] |
Sen. Bob Paulson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 4 |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |