ND SB2133 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 57-60-01, subsection 1 of section 57-60-02, and section 57-60-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the coal conversion facilities privilege tax; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The coal conversion facilities privilege tax; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |