ND SB2133 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 5-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to using false identification to obtain alcoholic beverages.
Title
Using false identification to obtain alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Sen. Curtis Olafson [R] |
Sen. Mac Schneider [D] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19 | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by Governor 04/19 | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-11 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-10 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 34 | |
2011-03-07 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10 | |
2011-01-31 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-01-17 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |