ND 2131 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks requested by the department of human services; to amend and reenact section 50-25.1-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to powers of the department of human services regarding requests for criminal history record checks made by children's advocacy centers; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers of the department of human services regarding requests for criminal history record checks made by children's advocacy centers; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2021-01-26HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2021-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback