ND 2131 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and section 43-26.1-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks by the North Dakota board of physical therapy for physical therapist and physical therapist assistant applicants and licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal history record checks by the North Dakota board of physical therapy for physical therapist and physical therapist assistant applicants and licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenateSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-20SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-16SenateSigned by President
2017-03-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-15SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 17
2017-03-09HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-23HouseRereferred to Human Services
2017-02-23HouseRequest return from committee
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2017-01-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-13SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2017-01-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback