ND 2128 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
Pending: Joint Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-17-42 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the corporate practice of medicine by nonprofit entities and charitable trusts; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The corporate practice of medicine by nonprofit entities and charitable trusts; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-01HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-29SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2021-01-28SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback