ND 2127 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-17-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the housing incentive fund; and to provide an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The housing incentive fund; and to provide an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
2021-02-19SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-14SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2021-01-13SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback