ND SB2126 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-51-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensure of foreign practitioners of occupations and professions.
Title
Licensure of foreign practitioners of occupations and professions.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |