ND 2125 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 43-12.3-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the health care professional student loan repayment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The health care professional student loan repayment program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-01-20HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-01-18SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2021-01-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback