ND SB2125 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-16 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |