ND 2124 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-12, two new subsections to section 37-17.1-05, a new section to chapter 50-11, and a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibitions on vaccine passports, the governor's authority to issue executive orders, unaccompanied undocumented children, and permitting a virtual meeting of the legislative management and a virtual session of the legislative assembly during a declared disaster or emergency; to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 23-01-05 and subsections 3 and 6 of section 37-17.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 50-25.1-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, as amended in section 2 of Senate Bill No. 2131, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, relating to the authority of the state health officer, the gubernatorial declaration of disaster or emergency powers of the department of human services, and criminal history record checks for children's advocacy centers; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The authority of the state health officer, the gubernatorial declaration of disaster or emergency powers of the department of human services, and criminal history record checks for children's advocacy centers; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36
2021-04-21SenateConcurred
2021-04-21SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-20HouseEmergency clause carried
2021-04-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 24
2021-04-20HouseDivision B passed
2021-04-20HouseDivision A passed
2021-04-20HouseDivision of bill
2021-04-20HouseReengrossed pursuant to HR 335
2021-04-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-03-22HouseCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-03-16HouseRereferred to Human Services
2021-03-16HouseRequest return from committee
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-05HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7
2021-02-01SenateLaid over one legislative day
2021-01-29SenateLaid over one legislative day
2021-01-28SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-27SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2021-01-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-01-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback