ND 2121 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-21-41.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to safety belt usage; to repeal section 39-21-41.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to secondary enforcement of safety belt requirements; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secondary enforcement of safety belt requirements; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
2021-03-19HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 28 nays 18
2021-01-19SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-18SenateReported back amended, without recommendation 6 0 0
2021-01-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback