ND SB2120 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 49-22-03 and subsection 1 of section 49-22-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of construction and energy conversion and transmission facility siting application fees.
Title
The definition of construction and energy conversion and transmission facility siting application fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Conference committee appointed Froseth Lefor Hunskor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Laffen Hogue Triplett |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 2 |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |