ND 2119 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT authorizing the state of North Dakota acting through job service North Dakota to sell or lease certain property; to provide for a study; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide reports to the budget section; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT authorizing the state of North Dakota acting through job service North Dakota to sell or lease certain property; to provide for a study; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide reports to the budget section; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateVetoed by Governor
2017-04-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-26SenateSigned by President
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-26HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 1
2017-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-25HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-25SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-25SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Monson Martinson Boe
2017-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Krebsbach Oehlke Mathern
2017-04-07SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-06SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-06HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 3
2017-04-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-21HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-24SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-06SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-06SenateRequest return from committee
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback