ND 2119 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 19-03.1-05, 19-03.1-07, 19-03.1-09, 19-03.1-11, and 19-03.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the scheduling of controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The scheduling of controlled substances.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-20 Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
2011-04-19 Signed by Governor 04/19
2011-04-18 Signed by President
2011-03-11 Signed by Speaker
2011-03-09 Returned to Senate
2011-03-08 Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2011-03-07 Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2011-03-07 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-02-23 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2011-02-17 Received from Senate
2011-02-16 Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2011-02-15 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-02-14 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2011-01-19 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-01-04 Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback