ND SB2118 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 26.1-36-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to short-term limited-duration health insurance plans; and to amend and reenact subsections 2 and 3 of section 26.1-36.4-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to short-term limited-duration health insurance plans.
Title
Short-term limited-duration health insurance plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:45 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |