ND 2113 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorized electronic monitoring of facility residents; to amend and reenact sections 12.1-31-14 and 50-10.2-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorized electronic monitoring of facility residents and privacy; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorized electronic monitoring of facility residents and privacy; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateSigned by Governor 04/11
2019-04-08SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-08SenateSigned by President
2019-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-04SenateConcurred
2019-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 51 nays 39
2019-03-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
2019-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-01-28HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-01-24SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-09SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback