ND SB2112 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-02-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to department of transportation branch office duties.
Title
Department of transportation branch office duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |