ND SB2097 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 37-01-43 and 37-03-02, subsection 8 of section 37-26-01, subsection 6 of section 37-28-02, and section 37-28-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the operation of the North Dakota national guard.
Title
The operation of the North Dakota national guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |