ND SB2097 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 39-03-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers of the highway patrol to promote public trust; to amend and reenact section 39-03-05, subsection 3 of section 39-12-02, and subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the contents of badges issued to patrolmen, interstate permits, and public security personnel possessing dangerous weapons; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The contents of badges issued to patrolmen, interstate permits, and public security personnel possessing dangerous weapons; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |