ND 2090 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT create and enact a new subsection to section 50-11.1-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history record checks; to amend and reenact section 50-06-01.9, subsection 25 of section 50-11.1-02, sections 50-11.1-03, 50-11.1-04, and 50-11.1-06, subsection 1 of section 50-11.1-06.2, subsection 1 of section 50-11.1-07.2, and sections 50-11.1-12, 50-11.1-16, and 50-11.1-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to early childhood services criminal record checks, licensing, definitions, registration, applications, and fees; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early childhood services criminal record checks, licensing, definitions, registration, applications, and fees; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateSigned by Governor 04/14
2017-04-12SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-12SenateSigned by President
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-10SenateConcurred
2017-04-10SenateReconsidered
2017-04-10SenateConference committee dissolved
2017-04-10HouseAppoint Rep. Damschen to replace Rep. Kiefert on conference committee
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Kiefert D. Anderson McWilliams
2017-03-31SenateConference committee appointed D. Larson Osland Nelson
2017-03-31SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-28SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 73 nays 19
2017-03-24HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-23HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-21HouseRereferred to Human Services
2017-02-21HouseRequest return from committee
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-01-10HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback