ND SB2089 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 17 of section 50-06-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to financing of welfare programs and housing stabilization supports and rental assistance; to repeal sections 1-02-35 and 50-06-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to obsolete effective date language and financing of welfare programs; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Obsolete effective date language and financing of welfare programs; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-19 | House | Conference committee appointed M. Ruby Beltz Schneider |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Lee Anderson Hogan |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-08 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |