ND 2088 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 50-28-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of an automated clearing house to facilitate payment to adoptive parents, to amend and reenact section 50-09-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to adoption assistance; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption assistance; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-11HouseReceived from Senate
2021-01-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-01-08SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-01-06SenateCommittee Hearing 11:15
2021-01-05SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback