ND SB2085 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of an automated clearing house to facilitate payment to medical assistance providers and provider applicants; to amend and reenact sections 50-24.1-26 and 50-24.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Medicaid waivers to provide in-home services and medical assistance and advanced practice registered nurses; to repeal section 50-24.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical assistance remedial eye care; and to provide for application.
Title
Medical assistance remedial eye care; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-23 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |