ND SB2084 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 25-03.1-20, subsection 3 of section 25-03.1-21, and section 25-03.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to involuntary treatment and emergency detention.
Title
Involuntary treatment and emergency detention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |