ND SB2077 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 18-04-04 and 26.1-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the imposition of a monetary penalty on insurance companies failing to report certain data to the insurance commissioner; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The imposition of a monetary penalty on insurance companies failing to report certain data to the insurance commissioner; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Thomas O'Brien Adams |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kreun Vedaa Burckhard |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-23 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 6 |
2021-03-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |