ND 2074 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the industrial commission and the agencies under the management of the industrial commission; to provide a continuing appropriation; to amend and reenact subsection? 2 of section 6-09-49 and sections 54-17-40, 54-18-19, and 57-62-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the infrastructure revolving loan fund, the housing incentive fund, the transfer of North Dakota mill and elevator profits to the general fund, and the coal development trust fund; to provide legislative intent; and to provide an exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The infrastructure revolving loan fund, the housing incentive fund, the transfer of North Dakota mill and elevator profits to the general fund, and the coal development trust fund; to provide legislative intent; and to provide an exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-27 - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-27SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
2017-01-26SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2017-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback