ND 2073 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 27-20.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to guardianships of children; to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 27-20-02, section 27-20-03, subsection 1 of section 27-20-06, sections 27-20-46, 27-20-48.1, and subsection 1 of section 27-20-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to guardianships of children; and to repeal sections 27-20-48.2, 27-20-48.3, and 27-20-48.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to guardianships of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardianships of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateSigned by Governor 04/11
2019-04-08SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-08SenateSigned by President
2019-04-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-04SenateConcurred
2019-03-29SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 3
2019-03-28HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2019-03-12HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-01-11HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-01-08SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-08SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback