ND SB2072 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 30.1-27-01, 30.1-27-02, 30.1-27-05, 30.1-27-06, 30.1-27-07, 30.1-27-08, 30.1-27-09, and 30.1-27-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to guardianship of minors; and to repeal sections 30.1-27-03, 30.1-27-04, 30.1-27-10, and 30.1-27-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to guardianships of minors.
Title
Guardianships of minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 3 |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |