ND SB2070 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 23.1-10-04, 23.1-10-05, 23.1-10-06, 23.1-10-07, 23.1-10-08, 23.1-10-09, 23.1-10-10, 23.1-10-11, 23.1-10-12, 23.1-10-13, 23.1-10-14, 23.1-10-15, 23.1-10-16, and 23.1-10-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulated substance response; to amend and reenact sections 11-33-01, 23.1-10-02, 40-47-01, and 58-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulated substance response; to repeal sections 23.1-04-04 and 23.1-10-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contaminated properties; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
Contaminated properties; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 12 |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |