ND SB2070 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 19-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to immunity from criminal liability for an individual who reports a medical emergency involving drugs.
Title
Immunity from criminal liability for an individual who reports a medical emergency involving drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2015-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Larson Brabandt Wallman |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Armstrong Luick Nelson |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |